LEWIN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1031512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preschool for children aged 2 1/2 to 5 years old

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024

Total income: £108,993
Total expenditure: £122,397

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LEWIN PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alanna Eileen Richardson Chair 08 October 2019
None on record
Mari Ebbitt Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
JOSEPHINE HUTTON Trustee 08 October 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, STREATHAM
Received: On time
RAYMOND SMITH Trustee 03 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £121.13k £157.70k £127.17k £109.32k £108.99k
Total expenditure £142.12k £137.85k £123.94k £132.06k £122.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £126.45k N/A £108.54k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2023 04 April 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 04 April 2024 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2020 19 April 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lewin Pre School
11A Natal Road
LONDON
SW16 6JA
Phone:
02086779450
Website:

No information available