THE CRYPT PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children below compulsory school age by: a) providing safe and satisfying group play, in which parents have the right to take part b) encouraging other charitable activities through which parents may help the children c) furthering the aims of the Pre-school Playgroups Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £60,255 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 January 1994: Standard registration
- THE CRYPT PRESCHOOL (Working name)
- FALMOUTH COMMUNITY PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- FALMOUTH PRE SCHOOL COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chelsea Morrall | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowenna Brock | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kezia Black | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.09k | £135.35k | £63.98k | £65.98k | £75.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.69k | £137.98k | £74.38k | £68.77k | £71.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £53.77k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.45k | £112.50k | N/A | £57.22k | £60.26k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 July 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 July 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 246 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS CHURCH
KILLIGREW STREET
FALMOUTH
CORNWALL
TR11 3PR
- Phone:
- 01326 210900
- Email:
- THECRYPT.FAL01@BTCONNECT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window