Financial history BROMLEY YOUTH MUSIC TRUST

Charity Number: 1031590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.83m £1.48m £1.44m £1.65m £1.59m
Total expenditure £1.80m £1.46m £1.52m £1.76m £1.66m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £495.01k £872.75k £499.96k £517.14k £501.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £62.54k £75.10k £81.21k £82.34k £99.42k
Income - Other trading activities £1.17m £468.77k £824.08k £1.05m £945.42k
Income - Charitable activities £595.76k £934.20k £529.33k £517.14k £536.98k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.07k £859 £547 £3.18k £8.94k
Income - Other £1.93k £412 £3.18k £4.00k £3.34k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £49.93k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.80m £1.46m £1.52m £1.76m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £3.91k £2.60k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0