Governing document PLUS (PROVIDENCE LINC UNITED SERVICES)
Charity Number: 1031595

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JANUARY 1993, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 DECEMBER 1993, 25 SEPTEMBER 1995, 29TH JULY 2005 AND 17 MAY 2010 as amended on 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 18 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
PROVIDING RELIEF FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL CARE SERVICES AND SUPPORT SERVICES TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE LONDON BOROUGHS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.