Accounts and annual returns BALLINGER B.A.T.S.

Charity Number: 1031636
Charity reporting is overdue by 1813 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 352 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 352 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 718 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 718 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1083 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1083 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1448 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1448 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1813 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1813 days