Birwa Kurdish Community

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enjoining good and forbidding evil, planting the seeds of love, tolerance and truth In our divided and troubled society, and restoring confidence in ourselves and those around us. We believe in integration as members of one body or one compassionate family. Our goal is to excel in family education, raise children correctly, and lead by example in helping each other in good deeds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 January 1994: Standard registration
- Giving for the Living (Previous name)
- Help the Kurds (Previous name)
- HELP THE KURDS (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamaran Shiwani | Chair | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Nawzad Sidik Salih | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Abdulsamad Amin | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abdulrahman Salih | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emad Ahmad Mohammad | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
farhad abdelkarim | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarteep Kader | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 1994 as amended on 22 Aug 2022 as amended on 06 Mar 2023 as amended on 20 Nov 2024 as amended on 06 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN LONDON WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MEMBERS OF THE KURDISH COMMUNITY, INCLUDING SURVIVORS AND VICTIMS OF THE GENOCIDE IN KURDISTAN TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE KURDISH COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; B) INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE KURDISH COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY; C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED KURDISH COMMUNITY OF LONDON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY BY ENCOURAGING CHILDREN, ADOLESCENTS, YOUNG ADULTS AND MOTHERS TO LEARN ENGLISH, MATHEMATICS, COMPUTER LITERACY AS WELL AS THEIR ORIGINS LANGUAGE AND CULTURE, THEIR FAITH PRINCIPLES AND THEIR RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
KURDISTAN AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Birwa Kurdish Community Centre
656 London Road
HOUNSLOW
TW3 1PG
- Phone:
- 07738525343
- Email:
- Kurds.kmc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window