ST MICHAELS PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care and education of pre-school children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 26 January 1994: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 May 2011: Re-registered
- 14 November 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/02/2005 | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.95k | £18.80k | £27.02k | £24.52k | £34.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.11k | £17.72k | £18.95k | £29.78k | £30.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 24 September 2012 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 24 September 2012 | 86 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 20 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window