Accounts and annual returns FORDEN PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031663
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 04 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 January 2025 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 20 January 2025 234 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 July 2023 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required