WOKING AREA U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A branch for Woking of the University Of The Third Age with about 1,600 members most of whom are retired.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Nicholson | Chair | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Adams | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cunliffe | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Philip Heaton | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek Hancock | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Turvey | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Maunders | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Galliflent-Holmes | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Sinclair Chalmers | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER NICHOLAS Grieve | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.21k | £14.53k | £68.61k | £101.30k | £106.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.21k | £19.82k | £71.78k | £86.37k | £100.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT WHO ARE IN THEIR THIRD AGE (BEING THE PERIOD OF TIME AFTER THE FIRST AGE OF CHILDHOOD DEPENDENCE AND THE SECOND AGE OF FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT AND/OR PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY) RESIDING IN WOKING AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY II. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PEOPLE IN THEIR THIRD AGE
Area of benefit
WOKING AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woking Area U3A
PO Box 695
Addlestone
Surrey
KT15 9FJ
- Phone:
- 01483323503
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window