MATTHEW NELSON BRAITHWAITE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust pays the 10% of all building costs for Dacre Braithwaite C of E ( VA ) Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Elizabeth Marshall | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Enid Marjorie Moorhouse | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JOHN FORT BEM | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev Alastair Ferneley | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY JANE GRAYSHON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.64k | £5.59k | £5.52k | £5.76k | £6.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £5.52k | £1.49k | £2.38k | £5.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1. THE LAND AND BUILDINGS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY TO BE APPROPRIATED AND USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL. 2. THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE APPLIED IN ASSISTING THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL TO DISCHARGE THEIR OBLIGATIONS WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL. 3.(A) PROVIDING AT THE SCHOOL SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY; AND (B) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING INSTRUCTION IN THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL AND OTHER YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF DACRE WITH HARTWITH AND DARLEY WITH THORNTHWAITE AND UPPER NIDDERDALE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Linked charities
- 20 March 1987 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
PADSIDE GREEN HOUSE
PADSIDE
HARROGATE
HG3 4AL
- Phone:
- 01423780285
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window