ROTARY CLUB OF NORTHWICH VALE ROYAL TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One of 2 Rotary Clubs in Northwich that provide an opportunity for community service for both men & women. Our fund raising activities include:The Northwich Beer Festival & Christmas collections. Funds raised support charities in Cheshire and the North West of England as well as Rotary International initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 21 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Watson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hills | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nic Abbott | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Rogers | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Christopher O'Brien | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.33k | £10.56k | £18.43k | £17.17k | £21.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.64k | £11.65k | £15.18k | £16.42k | £17.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME IN THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Kestrel Road
NORTHWICH
Cheshire
CW8 4TL
- Phone:
- 01606882017
- Email:
- www.rcnvr@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
northwichvaleroyalrotary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window