COSMETIC TOILETRY AND PERFUMERY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's programme, Look Good Feel Better, is a national charity helping to boost the physical and emotional wellbeing of people living with cancer. It runs confidence boosting workshops for Women, Young Adults and Men in around 140 key cancer support locations throughout the UK as well as online. Online tutorials and booklets are also provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,931,596
Donations and legacies | £935.63k | |
Charitable activities | £1.67m | |
Other trading activities | £327.52k | |
Investments | £1.14k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,032,793
Raising funds | £737.27k | |
Charitable activities | £1.50m | |
Other | £791.02k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.50m |
People

24 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
800 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 January 1994: Standard registration
- C T P F - LOOK GOOD FEEL BETTER - L G F B (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey Michael Percy | Chair | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Harbon | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Smith | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Roy Sheath | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Wallace | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Spillman | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chrys Andradi | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Hunter | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH CHARLES GREEN | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANN LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.87m | £1.59m | £1.58m | £2.20m | £2.93m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80m | £1.28m | £1.60m | £2.25m | £3.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £131.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.76m | £1.16m | £1.39m | £728.47k | £935.63k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £111.61k | £292.84k | £183.05k | £1.38m | £327.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £78.83k | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.00k | £2.20k | £1.05k | £3.71k | £1.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £131.34k | £4.00k | £5.01k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.31m | £898.69k | £1.22m | £1.15m | £1.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £490.86k | £380.93k | £379.20k | £469.94k | £737.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.41k | £6.96k | £12.44k | £18.61k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £632.97k | £791.02k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.02k | £46.41k | £55.09k | £45.09k | £26.48k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £897.34k | £1.30m | £1.19m | £1.08m | £996.63k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £147.01k | £248.44k | £169.85k | £97.56k | £98.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/10/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO GIVE ASSISTANCE HELP ADVICE COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION TO CANCER PATIENTS (“PATIENTS”) WHO HAVE SUFFERED APPEARANCE-RELATED SIDEEFFECTS FROM CHEMOTHERAPY, RADIOTHERAPY AND/OR OTHER TREATMENTS UNDERGONE BY THEM FOR OR IN RELATION TO CANCER AND TO FOUND DEVELOP AND PROMOTE THE “LOOK GOOD FEEL BETTER” PROGRAMME AND OTHER SIMILAR PROGRAMMES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND TO PROVIDE COSMETIC PRODUCTS, VOLUNTEER BEAUTY CONSULTANTS, MAKEOVER WORKSHOPS AND OTHER NECESSARY SUPPORT TO SUCH PATIENTS WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING THEM IN IMPROVING THEIR APPEARANCE AND QUALITY OF LIFE; 2.TO GIVE ASSISTANCE, HELP, ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND INFORMATION TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE APPEARANCE-RELATED SIDE-EFFECTS RESULTING FROM CANCER AND/OR OTHER DISEASE, ILLNESS, INJURY OR CONDITION; 3.TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE STUDY INTO AND RESEARCH RELATED TO THE RELATIONSHIP BETWEEN APPEARANCE, QUALITY OF LIFE AND RECOVERY TO HEALTH OF PATIENTS AND THE EFFECTS OF SUCH RECOVERY, AND TO EDUCATE AND INFORM THE PUBLIC AS TO THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cosmetic Toiletry & Perfumery
Foundation
32 West Hill
EPSOM
KT19 8JD
- Phone:
- 01372747500
- Email:
- info@lgfb.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window