CHIPPING WARDEN SCHOOL KINDERGARTEN

Charity number: 1031732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides pre-school education for children in the surrounding areas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £162,667
Total expenditure: £152,760

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHIPPING WARDEN SCHOOL KINGERGARTEN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Isherwood Chair 01 September 2013
None on record
Emma Jane O'Neill Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Valerie Woodford Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Emily Rose Buttrum Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Mrs Lucy Cullen Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £103.22k £100.36k £125.73k £164.28k £162.67k
Total expenditure £106.65k £95.69k £122.95k £151.74k £152.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.05k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 18 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 21 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 09 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Chipping Warden Primary Academy
Byfield Road
Chipping Warden
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX17 1LD
Phone:
01295660025