2ND HEALD GREEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1031738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £81,603
Total expenditure: £85,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Stockport

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1997: Standard registration
  • 09 January 1998: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Niral Mehta Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Stian Soiland-Reyes Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Tanya Cross Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Janet Jackson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Zeenat Rasul Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Charmain May Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Peter Metcalfe Trustee 01 September 2019
GREATER MANCHESTER EAST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £22.02k £18.12k £34.83k £41.21k £81.60k
Total expenditure £20.87k £11.67k £33.99k £36.06k £85.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.61k £1.90k N/A £2.74k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY PARTICULARLY ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH, RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NORTH DEVON
Registration history
  • 09 April 1997 : Standard registration
  • 09 January 1998 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
39 Wilton Avenue
Heald Green
CHEADLE
Cheshire
SK8 3LY
Phone:
07815314763
Website:

2ndhealdgreen.org.uk