Accounts and annual returns PORTOBELLO COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031764
Charity reporting is overdue by 1719 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Annual return 15 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 624 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 624 days
Annual return 15 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 989 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 989 days
Annual return 15 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1354 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1354 days
Annual return 15 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1719 days
Accounts and TAR 15 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1719 days