THE EDWARD BETHAM FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ORGANISE SUMMER FAIRS, JUNIOR DISCOS AND PROVIDE TEA AND COFFEE MORNINGS. WE HAVE A PENSIONER'S CHRISTMAS TEA AND PROVIDE TEA AND COFFEE FOR CHURCH MASSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ealing
Governance
- 21 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jaroslava Braunsteinova | Chair | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Sims | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachelle Locke | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Laryea | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Radosveta Karpuzova | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Dodd | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alla Kashif | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Gee | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Handa | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Afshan Banjoko | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alishia Williams-Gayle | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Chamberlain | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.78k | £5.96k | £6.32k | £13.77k | £17.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.83k | £5.26k | £2.01k | £8.03k | £23.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 August 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 July 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
11 July 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edward Betham CoE Primary School
Oldfield Lane South
GREENFORD
UB6 9JU
- Phone:
- 02085788928
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window