Accounts and annual returns FIRST STEPS PRESCHOOL (ROCESTER)

Charity number: 1031804
Charity reporting is up to date (288 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 April 2025 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 April 2025 288 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 April 2025 654 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 April 2025 654 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 April 2025 1019 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 April 2025 1019 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2022 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 July 2022 376 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 October 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 October 2020 94 days late Download Open in new window