EARL RISE PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides supervised development through play for 2 - 5 yr olds in a safe secure environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £36,794 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 20 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jackie Edwards | Chair | 19 June 2010 |
|
|
||||
Katie Haisman | Trustee | 19 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIA EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.99k | £51.03k | £37.52k | £42.64k | £37.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.24k | £50.77k | £48.46k | £42.11k | £48.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.16k | £51.03k | £37.01k | £41.85k | £36.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
196 MARMADON ROAD
LONDON
SE18 1EQ
- Phone:
- 02083172140
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window