HERMITAGE PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1031844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Pre-school for children aged from 2.5 upwards.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £84,279
Total expenditure: £77,245

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kerry Danielle Faulkner Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Fiona Louise Sparkes Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Sarah Jayne Stroud Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record
Hannah Louise McIntosh Trustee 06 September 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £50.04k £40.47k £51.72k £74.78k £84.28k
Total expenditure £44.88k £38.56k £45.74k £58.23k £77.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £36.21k £30.29k £32.83k £55.75k £59.58k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 15 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Pinewood Crescent
Hermitage
Thatcham
RG18 9WL
Phone:
01635200164