Trustees CRANBROOK WINDMILL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1031879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Patrick Gasson Trustee 26 November 2023
None on record
Donna Rose Larkin Trustee 26 November 2023
None on record
David Hall Trustee 28 November 2021
None on record
Andrew Riddell Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Dr Susan Hooper Trustee 25 November 2018
THE FRIENDS OF HODGKIN HOUSE
Received: On time
Ian William Royal Burrows Trustee 27 November 2016
None on record
NICK VINALL Trustee 20 December 2012
None on record
PAT HALL Trustee 20 December 2012
None on record