DURHAM U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds meetings each month for members with a lecture. Also group meetings where members follow interests such as French, German, circle dancing, poetry, literature, local history, music, walking and reading Shakespeare and social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 21 January 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Willock | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Mary Woods | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Joseph Newby | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Mary Mulkerrin | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN BENNETT | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Noreen Freeman | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN CRAIK | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TINA NAPLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.67k | £3.44k | £376 | £4.50k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.37k | £2.70k | £1.31k | £4.29k | £4.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 9 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
DURHAM AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Sunderland Road
DURHAM
DH1 2QH
- Phone:
- 01913741928
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window