Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF CANTERBURY TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1031915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.10k £18.43k £52.57k £109.42k £8.65k
Total expenditure £37.60k £24.89k £26.68k £26.26k £19.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A