ENERGIZER BUS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community development work, mobile community work, training and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 27 January 1994: Standard registration
- 11 January 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MILTON KEYNES MOBILE PLAY AND COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | £11.78k | £10.61k | £1.76k | £9.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £11.12k | £11.96k | £26.62k | £10.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 10 February 2010 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 23 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 01 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 01 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 05 June 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH NOVEMBER 1993 AND AMENDED ON 17 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
1) TO ENCOURAGE THE PROVISION OF MOBILE FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE FACILITATION OF PLAY AND COMMUNITY OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESIDENTS IN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES 2) TO ENHANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF MILTON KEYNES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window