BOURNEMOUTH ISLAMIC CENTRE AND CENTRAL MOSQUE (BICCM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust provides a place of worship for Muslims and also provides essential Islamic education for the local Muslim community, both children and adults. The Mosque also acts as a community centre for social contact for both Indigenous and visiting Muslims,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 28 January 1994: Standard registration
- BOURNEMOUTH ISLAMIC CENTRE (Previous name)
- BOURNEMOUTH ISLAMIC CENTRE AND CENTRAL MOSQUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSSEIN HASSAN ABUDAWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ammar Al Khiami | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Hussein Abudawood | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Fahed Hssein El Sharqawi | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR HAMMADI NAIT CHARIF | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHAMMED ANWAR GHAZAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.93k | £18.52k | £44.07k | £48.91k | £59.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.49k | £11.84k | £21.04k | £14.20k | £31.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 20 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE BOURNEMOUTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 ST. STEPHENS ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH2 6JJ
- Phone:
- 01202557072
- Email:
- biccm@talk21.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window