Financial history LILLIPUT PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £116.74k £127.74k £92.54k £107.60k £128.06k
Total expenditure £110.59k £98.85k £108.70k £109.64k £120.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.74k N/A N/A N/A