Financial history BUCKHORN WESTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1032088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.71k £563 £6.33k £14.51k £8.28k
Total expenditure £11.80k £1.73k £2.51k £13.10k £7.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A