Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WELLESLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1032105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required