CAT CALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Hastings, St Leonards, Bexhill and Battle area "LOST and FOUND" cat register putting lost cats and kittens back in touch with their families, we maintain a register and proactively liaise with other charities and agencies to reunite lost cats with their owners, additionally our experienced team are on hand to offer advice on all cat and kitten related problems..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 26 January 1994: Standard registration
- THE LOST & FOUND CAT REGISTER (Working name)
- THE LOST AND FOUND CAT REGISTER (Working name)
- CATCALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lorraine Shackel | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA RAE MARSHALL | Trustee | 24 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.67k | £43.93k | £38.95k | £36.55k | £37.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.45k | £32.09k | £32.62k | £39.43k | £47.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT CRUELTY AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF CATS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE EAST SUSSEX AND KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
164 Edmund Road
HASTINGS
TN35 5LQ
- Phone:
- 01424429904
- Email:
- catcallcharity@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window