Accounts and annual returns NEWTON-ON-THE-MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1032146
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 16 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 27 April 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required