Accounts and annual returns HOOK NORTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1032151
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2014 27 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 27 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2013 10 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 10 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 17 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 17 October 2012 On Time