Financial history HOOK NORTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1032151
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014
Total gross income £96.52k £93.67k £108.53k £100.83k £107.93k
Total expenditure £85.76k £93.46k £98.85k £100.45k £101.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A