FRIENDS REACHING OUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty.Advancement of Education of Orphans in Uganda.Establishing homes /orphanages. Setting up young people in business. Paying for School, college & University Fees as well as vocational training. Providing food & shelter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Uganda
Governance
- 27 January 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS REACHING OUT (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF KAPEEKA ORPHANAGE (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV STEVE FISHPOOL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT DAVIDGE | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joy Dale | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS ALI FISHPOOL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.05k | £62.98k | £65.84k | £52.60k | £62.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.84k | £42.93k | £45.74k | £95.29k | £88.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF ORPHANS IN UGANDA PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF HOMES ORPHANAGES OR OTHER SUCH INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE RURAL AREAS OF UGANDA
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MAPLE CLOSE
HORSHAM
RH12 4EZ
- Phone:
- 07861483184
- Email:
- info@friendsreachingout.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window