CHEDDINGTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School for children aged two to four years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £93,771 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 27 January 1994: Standard registration
- 09 May 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- CHEDDINGTON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.55k | £117.14k | £120.23k | £99.98k | £128.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.29k | £98.44k | £124.89k | £129.33k | £127.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.23k | £4.85k | £79.21k | £93.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2023
(These accounts |
01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 July 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 July 2022 | 32 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 17 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AND 27TH FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window