Financial history OAK FARM PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1032174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.37k £81.47k £94.99k £99.53k £12.60m
Total expenditure £93.21k £89.56k £100.36k £114.66k £13.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £100 £94.99k £99.53k £12.60m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.60m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.70m
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0