Trustees OAK FARM PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1032174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Guinness Chair 06 January 2018
None on record
Kimberley Ryan Trustee 16 December 2021
None on record
kerry Doody Trustee 12 September 2021
None on record
fiona Von Mollendorf Trustee 11 January 2018
None on record
sara small Trustee 13 July 2017
None on record