FRIENDS OF GILLINGSTOOL COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and social event at Gillingstool Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 January 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF GILLINGSTOOL (Working name)
- GILLINGSTOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sabina Hamilton | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Azahara Corroto | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harris | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.79k | £1.79k | £2.93k | £1.88k | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.84k | £1.84k | £1.95k | £3.09k | £962 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 July 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATTCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
GILLINGSTOOL PRIMARY SCHOOL
GILLINGSTOOL
THORNBURY
BRISTOL
BS35 2EG
- Phone:
- 01454866527
- Email:
- OFFICE@GILLINGSTOOL.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window