Accounts and annual returns CRANBROOK AND HAWKHURST ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1032191
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 October 2021 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 05 May 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 16 September 2019 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required