SIRI GURU TEG BAHADAR SAHIB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a place of worship for sikhism, facilities for the sikh community, provide services and advice to support the community and alleviate poverty and hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 31 January 1994: Standard registration
- GURDWARA TEG BAHADUR SAHIB (Working name)
- SIRI GURU TEGH BHADUR SAHIB (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVTAR SINGH | Trustee | 27 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER SINGH | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMERIK SINGH RATHORE | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
DALEEP SINGH DIGWA | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
GURNAM SINGH DIGWA | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.88k | £33.89k | £77.08k | £91.40k | £100.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.47k | £37.32k | £45.01k | £68.33k | £94.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
19 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 September 2022 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2022 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 April 2022 | 448 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 10 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND OBSERVE THE SIKH RELIGION AND TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP THERFOR. 2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE MEMBERS AND THE STUDY OF THE PUNJABI LANGUAGE. 3) TO RELIEVE MEMBERS IN NEED AS DECIDED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 ST MARKS ROAD
NEWTOWN
SOUTHAMPTON
HAMPSHIRE
SO14 0NW
- Phone:
- 02380233592
- Email:
- gtbsbhatsoton@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window