POSTMAN PAT PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE SCHOOL FULL DAY CARE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 01 February 1994: Standard registration
- 12 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.63k | £160.46k | £203.92k | £195.43k | £243.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.29k | £153.16k | £182.37k | £198.20k | £247.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £160.18k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 27 April 2017 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2016
(These accounts |
27 April 2017 | 81 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 18 April 2016 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 18 April 2016 | 73 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window