ASSOCIATION OF CANCER PHYSICIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the study and practice of cancer medicine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 1994: Standard registration
- ACP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Richard Henry John Begent | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.93k | £66.64k | £139.91k | £103.22k | £81.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.71k | £55.14k | £126.92k | £122.92k | £130.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/03/1993 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2001 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CANCER MEDICINE, THROUGH THE SPECIALTY OF MEDICAL ONCOLOGY. TO FOSTER THE RAISING OF STANDARDS OF MEDICAL CARE FOR CANCER PATIENTS; TO FACILITATE CONTACT BETWEEN MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND OTHER INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH THE STUDY AND TREATMENT OF CANCER AND WITH THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
S A S Event Management
The Old George Brewery
Rollestone Street
SALISBURY
SP1 1DX
- Phone:
- 01722 339811
- Email:
- alison.norton@icr.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window