Financial history BLACK COUNTRY WOMEN'S AID

Charity number: 1032298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.43m £6.21m £7.51m £8.60m £10.02m
Total expenditure £4.47m £5.14m £5.69m £7.07m £8.22m
Income from government contracts £762.88k £2.36m £3.61m £524.79k £555.69k
Income from government grants £1.52m £2.18m £2.71m £7.80m £9.02m
Income - Donations and legacies £96.65k £107.12k £91.99k £155.36k £372.31k
Income - Other trading activities £45.14k £34.67k £79.77k £116.46k £65.33k
Income - Charitable activities £5.29m £6.04m £7.34m £0 £9.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £27.85k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.47m £5.14m £5.69m £7.07m £8.22m
Expenditure - Raising funds £540 £438 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0