BURPHAM PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burpham Pre-School is for children between the ages of 2 and 5 years. The pre-school is open 9.15 - 2.30, Monday, Tuesday, Wednesday and 9.15 - 1pm on Fridays, 38 weeks of the year. It is registered with Ofsted (registration number 119959) and can accommodate 30 children per session. The pre-school adhere to all aspects of the new EYFS when planning for each individual child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £80,544 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 March 1994: Standard registration
- 07 October 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 October 2021: Funds transferred to 1190881 BURPHAM PRESCHOOL
- BURPHAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.84k | £74.66k | £68.63k | £68.96k | £96.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.16k | £65.64k | £58.94k | £63.89k | £80.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | £56.73k | £54.90k | £51.53k | £80.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 10 December 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE, BURPHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window