THE HUDDLESTON CENTRE IN HACKNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Huddleston Centre is based in Hackney and supports Hackney residents. Our aim is to enable disabled people and their families to take maximum control of their lives, and play a full and active role in the community. Activities include: junior and senior youth clubs, access (sports) scheme, residential trips, a high needs club, school holiday play schemes and Saturday clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
Total income includes £8,405 from 1 government contract(s) and £19,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 31 January 1994: Standard registration
- THE HUDDLESTON CENTRE (Working name)
- THE HUDDLESTON CENTRE YOUTH PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER SHORT | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Reeves | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Delisser | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ersan Akinci | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cookey | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.88k | £120.99k | £86.96k | £17.33k | £194.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £168.06k | £102.15k | £85.98k | £84.35k | £115.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.88k | N/A | £8.94k | £4.08k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £121.23k | £83.69k | £77.35k | N/A | £19.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 10 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPT 1993 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH DISBILITIES AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION RECREATION AND EMPLYMENT
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
329 Queensbridge Road
LONDON
E8 3LA
- Phone:
- 02089859089
- Email:
- info@huddlestoncentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window