MAIDEN NEWTON AND DISTRICT PRESCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Childcare services for children from birth to 11 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £55,483 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 February 1994: Standard registration
- 07 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 07 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1158085 MAIDEN NEWTON CHILDCARE PROVISION
- MAIDEN NEWTON AND DISTRICT PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.25k | £66.21k | £94.44k | £97.20k | £102.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.66k | £50.12k | £86.48k | £86.77k | £96.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £55.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 11 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 27 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 22 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 29 November 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOVEMBER 1993. NAME CHANGED BY RESOLUTION 12 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDER STAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window