Financial history TICEHURST AND FLIMWELL SCHOOL P.T.A

Charity Number: 1032375
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £3.62k £5.24k £4.91k £6.01k £2.61k
Total expenditure £4.78k £5.23k £4.52k £6.33k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A