Trustees RUGBY MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity number: 1032393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David George Mayes | Chair | 27 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frederick William Mander | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sinclair Banks | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael John Iredale | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Birkin | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alec Clement Geoffrey Taylor | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stanley Edward Parnell | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EATON CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.