PIKEMERE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1032401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To organise events to raise funds to benefit the pupils at Pikemere Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £16,122
Total expenditure: £16,682

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PIKEMERE PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lydia Dickinson Chair 26 September 2024
None on record
Rebecca Walter Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Lisa Harrington Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Joanna Woolner Trustee 19 July 2023
None on record
Sarah Dennison Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Anthony Hughes Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Whitmore Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £5.27k £3.77k £913 £3.13k £16.12k
Total expenditure £5.48k £9.65k £107 £1.99k £16.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 July 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Pikemere School
Pikemere Road
Alsager
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST7 2SW
Phone:
01270874237