CAMBRIDGE MUSIC FESTIVAL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
presentation of public concerts rectital and other artistic events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 31 January 1994: Standard registration
- CAMBRIDGE MUSIC PROMOTIONS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Philip Crookall | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Winter | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Bewes | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam Greenwood-Byrne | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Stenner | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.88k | £75.30k | £185.07k | £220.57k | £180.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.90k | £43.46k | £200.40k | £217.23k | £182.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IMPROVE DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS RECITALS AND EVENTS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE COMPANY SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME AND IN SEEKING TO ARRANGE MUSICAL EVENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CITY AND UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE AND OF THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 City Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 1DP
- Phone:
- 07957983406
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window