Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF HYTHE AND WATERSIDE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1032430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.00k £5.25k £12.30k £15.06k £12.19k
Total expenditure £16.06k £8.21k £6.64k £14.68k £14.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A