FRIENDS OF HILLSIDE AVENUE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities at the school throughout the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 February 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Hume | Chair | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Elvin | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erin Bundey | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Amy Squirrell | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Twinn | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Eleanor Macleod | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Goodson | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Davison | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.98k | £6.18k | £24.32k | £28.88k | £28.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £6.91k | £20.66k | £20.99k | £26.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/12/1993 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLSIDE AVENUE PRIMARY SCHOOL
HILLSIDE AVENUE
NORWICH
NR7 0QW
- Phone:
- 01603433453
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window